NH SB173 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB173
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Public Hearing: 04/23/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Public Hearing: 04/23/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to surprise medical bills.
Title
Relative to surprise medical bills.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Public Hearing: 04/23/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-04-02 | House | Introduced 04/02/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 10 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | OT3rdg; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Pending Motion OT3rdg; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0049s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Floor Amendment # 2024-0049s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved Ought to Pass; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1 |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/03/2024, Vote 5-0; Senate Calendar 49 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/09/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Hearing: 02/01/2023, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 8 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB173 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9