NH SB173 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB173
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to surprise medical bills.
Title
Relative to surprise medical bills.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/09/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Hearing: 02/01/2023, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 8 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB173 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9