NH SB17 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - II. Remainder Effective 07/15/13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - II. Remainder Effective 07/15/13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study palliative care and associated quality of life initiatives.
Title
Establishing a commission to study palliative care and associated quality of life initiatives.
Sponsors
Sen. Peggy Gilmour [D] | Sen. David Boutin [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Bob Odell [R] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 07/15/13 |
2013-07-15 | Senate | I. Section 2 Effective 06/01/14 |
2013-07-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/15/13; Chapter 0225 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1712 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2013-2102e Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2102e Adopted [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1656 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Stiles Moved Concur with House Amendment #1585h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-05-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1585h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.1465-1466 |
2013-05-22 | House | Amendment #1585h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.1465-1466 |
2013-05-14 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-1585h; House Calendar39, PG.1279-1280 |
2013-05-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1585h for May 22 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar39, PG.1260-1261 |
2013-04-30 | House | Executive Session: 5/14/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-04-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 5/7/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-04-03 | House | Executive Session: 4/16/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 ==RECESSED== |
2013-04-03 | House | Public Hearing: 4/9/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 31, PG.1073 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 4 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 1/31/13; Senate Calendar 6 |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Hearing: 1/15/13, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 4 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health, Education and Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |