NH SB17 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-23 - Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10, Pg.184
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-23 - Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10, Pg.184
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to evidence of admissions in medical injury actions.
Title
Relative to evidence of admissions in medical injury actions.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10, Pg.184 | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/23/11; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Hearing: 2/10/2011, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 10 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Sen. Bradley Moved to Vacate SB 17 from Health & Human Services to Judiciary, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 3, Pg.27 | |
2011-01-04 | Senate Introduced 1/5/2011 and Referred to Health & Human Services, Senate Journal 1, Pg.20 |