NH SB169 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Sen. D'Allesandro Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to recovery of expenditures from the drinking water and groundwater trust fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to recovery of expenditures from the drinking water and groundwater trust fund.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenateSen. D'Allesandro Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1614h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 7
2019-05-08HouseAmendment # 2019-1614h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 7
2019-05-01HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1614h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 22-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 5
2019-04-24HouseExecutive Session: 05/01/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-04-24HouseDivision I Work Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212
2019-04-08HousePublic Hearing: 04/23/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Finance House Journal 11 P. 70
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1011s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateSen. Morse Floor Amendment # 2019-1011s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateSen. Morse Moved Ought to Pass; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-05SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-02-06SenateHearing: 02/12/2019, Room 103, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback