NH SB168 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor on 05/07/2015; Chapter 0032; Effective 07/06/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor on 05/07/2015; Chapter 0032; Effective 07/06/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the duties of the commissioner of the department of environmental services.
Title
Relative to the duties of the commissioner of the department of environmental services.
Sponsors
Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. Peter Bixby [D] | Sen. Russell Prescott [R] | Rep. Judith Spang [D] |
Rep. Carol Bush [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Adam Schroadter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/07/2015; Chapter 0032; Effective 07/06/2015 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 4/9/2015); Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-29 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 36, PG. 1597 |
2015-04-15 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1549 |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Apr 15 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG. 1306 |
2015-04-09 | House | Executive Session: 4/7/2015 Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-04-01 | House | Public Hearing: 4/7/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-03-25 | House | Public Hearing: 3/31/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-03-19 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 3/24/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-03-18 | House | Public Hearing: 3/24/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-03-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 26, PG. 1274 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0454s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0454s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0454s, 3/3/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Hearing: 2/11/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4 |