NH SB162 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2013; Chapter 0187; Effective 06/30/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2013; Chapter 0187; Effective 06/30/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the student tuition guaranty fund and making provisions for the disbursement of remaining funds.
Title
Repealing the student tuition guaranty fund and making provisions for the disbursement of remaining funds.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. Barbara Shaw [D] | Rep. Patricia Lovejoy [D] |
Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Timothy Copeland [R] | Rep. Patrick Abrami [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2013; Chapter 0187; Effective 06/30/2013 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1711 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Stiles Moved Concur with House Amendment #1401h, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1569 |
2013-05-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for June 5 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar42, PG.1428 |
2013-05-15 | House | Executive Session: 5/29/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2013-05-15 | House | Division II Work Session: 5/28/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 209 |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred to Finance; House Journal 41, PG.1397 |
2013-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1401h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG.1397 |
2013-05-08 | House | Amendment #1401h(NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG.1397 |
2013-04-30 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-1401h (New Title); House Calendar36, PG.1220 |
2013-04-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1401h(NT) for May 8 (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar36, PG.1201 |
2013-04-17 | House | Executive Session: 4/30/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-04-09 | House | Public Hearing: 4/18/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-04-03 | House | Introduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 35, PG.1191 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/28/13; Senate Calendar 13 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0737s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0737s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0737s, New Title, 3/14/13; Senate Calendar 11 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Hearing: === RECONVENE === 2/19/13, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Hearing: === RECESSED === 2/12/13, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 11:30 a.m. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Hearing: 2/12/13, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 11:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health, Education & Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |