NH SB150 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-09 - Signed by the Governor on 08/04/2023; Chapter 0216; Effective 08/04/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-09 - Signed by the Governor on 08/04/2023; Chapter 0216; Effective 08/04/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the family mediator certification board.
Title
Relative to the family mediator certification board.
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Prentiss [D] | Sen. Debra Altschiller [D] | Sen. Rebecca Perkins Kwoka [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Sen. Donovan Fenton [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. Becky Whitley [D] | Rep. Corinne Morse [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-09 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 08/04/2023; Chapter 0216; Effective 08/04/2023 |
2023-07-19 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 House Journal 17 P. 18 |
2023-07-18 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/29/2023); Senate Journal 20 |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Sen. Pearl Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/15/2023; Senate Journal 19 |
2023-06-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1636h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 7 |
2023-06-08 | House | Amendment # 2023-1636h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 7 |
2023-05-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1636h 05/24/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2023-05-01 | House | Executive Session: 05/24/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-03-21 | House | Public Hearing: 03/30/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-03-20 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/09/2023; Senate Journal 6 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/09/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9A |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Hearing: 02/01/2023, Room 103, State House, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 5 |