NH SB14 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2015; Chapter 0114; Effective 08/07/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2015; Chapter 0114; Effective 08/07/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Making technical corrections to the laws relative to the judicial council and repealing a limitation on compensation of counsel for indigent defendants.
Title
Making technical corrections to the laws relative to the judicial council and repealing a limitation on compensation of counsel for indigent defendants.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Marjorie Smith [D] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] | Sen. Sam Cataldo [R] |
Rep. Robert Rowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2015; Chapter 0114; Effective 08/07/2015 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/21/2015); Senate Journal 16 |
2015-05-21 | House | Enrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1782 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-1603e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 5/14/2015); Senate Journal 15 |
2015-05-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-1603-EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG. 1778 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Sen. Carson Concurs with House Amendment #1242h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1242h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1545-1546 |
2015-04-15 | House | Amendment #1242h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1545-1546 |
2015-04-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1242h for Apr 15 (Vote 16-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG. 1305 |
2015-04-01 | House | Executive Session: 4/7/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-03-24 | House | Public Hearing: 3/31/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 22, PG. 628 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0005s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 4 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0005s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0005s, 1/29/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Hearing: 1/13/15, Room 100, State House, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 5 |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 2 |