NH SB137 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - II. Remainder Effective 08/09/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - II. Remainder Effective 08/09/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to temporary licensure of certain nurses seeking licensure by endorsement from the board of nursing.
Title
Relative to temporary licensure of certain nurses seeking licensure by endorsement from the board of nursing.
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. John Bordenet [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
Rep. Marjorie Shepardson [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 08/09/2017 |
2017-07-21 | Senate | I. Section 2 Effective 07/01/2019 |
2017-07-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2017; Chapter 0213 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-22 | House | Enrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 23 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19 |
2017-06-01 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1624h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 17 |
2017-06-01 | House | Amendment #2017-1624h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 17 |
2017-05-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1624h (NT) for 06/01/2017 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 8 |
2017-05-09 | House | Executive Session: 05/16/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-05-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 05/03/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-04-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/12/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-04-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/11/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-03-22 | House | Public Hearing: 03/29/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-03-16 | House | Introduced 03/09/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 10 P. 76 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-0565s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-0565s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0565s, 03/09/2017; Senate Calendar 12 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Hearing: 02/01/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:35 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 5 |