NH SB125 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-09 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 02/09/2023; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-09 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 02/09/2023; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to annual grants to regional development corporations.
Title
Relative to annual grants to regional development corporations.
Sponsors
Sen. Carrie Gendreau [R] | Sen. William Gannon [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Sen. Timothy Lang [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-09 | Senate | Pending Motion OT3rdg; 02/09/2023; Senate Journal 6 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Sen. Gray Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/09/2023; Senate Journal 6 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/09/2023; Senate Journal 6 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/09/2023; Senate Calendar 9A |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2023, Room 103, State House, 01:40 pm; Senate Calendar 8 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 5 |