NH SB124 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-24 - III. Remainder Effective 07/24/13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-24 - III. Remainder Effective 07/24/13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing an integrated land development permit.
Title
Establishing an integrated land development permit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-24 | Senate | III. Remainder Effective 07/24/13 |
2013-07-24 | Senate | II. Section 2-4 Effective 09/22/13 |
2013-07-24 | Senate | I. Section 1, 5 & 6 Effective 01/01/15 |
2013-07-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/24/13; Chapter 0270 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1714 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2013-2178e Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2178e Adopted; House Journal 52, PG.1712 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Prescott Moved Concur with House Amendments #1501h, #1863, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1863h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1568-1569 |
2013-06-05 | House | Amendment #1863h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1568-1569 |
2013-05-30 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-1863h; House Calendar42, PG.1453 |
2013-05-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1863h for June 5 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar42, PG.1428 |
2013-05-15 | House | Executive Session: 5/29/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2013-05-15 | House | Division I Work Session: 5/21/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred to Finance; House Journal 41, PG.1405 |
2013-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1501h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 218-137; House Journal 41, PG.1402-1405 |
2013-05-08 | House | Amendment #1501h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG.1402-1403 |
2013-05-01 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar36, PG.1203 |
2013-05-01 | House | Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2013-1501h; House Calendar36, PG.1216 |
2013-05-01 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1501h for May 8 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar36, PG.1203 |
2013-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 4/30/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-04-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/30/2013 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-04-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/23/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 4/16/2013 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 31, PG.1075 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0875s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Sen. Odell Floor Amendment #2013-0875s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/14/13; Senate Calendar 11 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Hearing: 2/7/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy & Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |