NH SB120 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Signed by the Governor on 07/29/2019; Chapter 303; Effective 09/27/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Signed by the Governor on 07/29/2019; Chapter 303; Effective 09/27/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the controlled drug prescription health and safety program.
Title
Relative to the controlled drug prescription health and safety program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/29/2019; Chapter 303; Effective 09/27/2019 |
2019-07-12 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 56 |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2644e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-07-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2644e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Sen. Sherman Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2284h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 17 |
2019-06-05 | House | Amendment # 2019-2284h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 17 |
2019-05-29 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2284h for 06/05/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 6 |
2019-05-21 | House | Executive Session: 05/28/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-05-08 | House | Public Hearing: 05/14/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Executive Departments and Administration 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 5 |
2019-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1528h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 5 |
2019-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2019-1528h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 5 |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1528h for 05/02/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 5 |
2019-04-10 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-04-10 | House | Division II Subcommittee Work Session: 04/17/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-04-10 | House | Division II Subcommittee Work Session: 04/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-04-03 | House | Public Hearing: 04/10/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 11 P. 73 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2019-1170s and 2019-1304s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Sen. Sherman Floor Amendment # 2019-1304s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1170s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Special Order to the beginning of the regular calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1170s, 03/27/2019; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Hearing: 03/12/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:45 pm; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |