NH SB111 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 233; Effective 07/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the collection of health care data.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the collection of health care data.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Adopt Amendment (Y: 135 N: 211 NV: 19 Abs: 33) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 233; Effective 07/12/2019
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-25SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2625e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-25HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2625e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 21
2019-06-18SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2466e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2466e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 46
2019-06-05HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 67
2019-06-05HouseAmendment # 2019-1789h: Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 135-211 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 67
2019-05-22HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1789h
2019-05-22HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/05/2019 (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 16
2019-05-14House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/21/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-04-30House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 05/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-04-17HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 04/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-04-17HousePublic Hearing: 04/24/2019 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 11 P. 73
2019-03-27SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1188s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-27SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1188s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1188s, 03/27/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15
2019-02-20SenateHearing: 03/13/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback