NH SB11 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2013; Chapter 0214; Effective 09/08/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2013; Chapter 0214; Effective 09/08/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to water and sewer utility districts and water or sewer utility districts.
Title
Relative to water and sewer utility districts and water or sewer utility districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Rep. Timothy Copeland [R] | Rep. Eileen Flockhart [D] | Sen. Russell Prescott [R] |
Rep. Donna Schlachman [D] | Rep. Patricia Lovejoy [D] | Rep. Patrick Abrami [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2013; Chapter 0214; Effective 09/08/2013 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-12 | House | Enrolled [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1654 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2013-2039e Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2039e Adopted [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1654 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sen. Boutin Moved Concur with House Amendment 1728h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-05-29 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1728h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 254-74; House Journal 45, PG.1520-1525 |
2013-05-29 | House | Recommit (Rep Flanagan): Motion Failed Division Vote 98-229; House Journal 45, PG.1523 |
2013-05-29 | House | Lay on the Table (Rep LeBrun): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 86-244; House Journal 45, PG.1521-1523 |
2013-05-29 | House | Floor Amendment #2013-1728h (Rep Roberts): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 45, PG.1521 |
2013-05-29 | House | Special Order to End of Today's Regular Calendar (Rep Tucker): Motion Adopted Division Vote 275-45; House Journal 45, PG.1515-1516 |
2013-05-08 | House | Special Order to Next Session in Regular Calendar Order (Rep Porter): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG.1419-1420 |
2013-05-08 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Hoell); House Journal 41, PG.1386 |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 8 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar40, PG.1372 |
2013-04-17 | House | Executive Session: 4/24/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 301 ==Or 30 Minutes After House Session== |
2013-04-09 | House | Public Hearing: 4/16/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 31, PG.1073 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0124s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0124s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0124s, 2/14/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Hearing: 1/16/13, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 4 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public & Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |