NH SB108 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 48, PG.1631
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 48, PG.1631
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to emergency obstetrical care.
Title
Relative to emergency obstetrical care.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. Gene Chandler [R] | Sen. Tom DeBlois [R] | Sen. John Gallus [R] |
Sen. Molly Kelly [D] | Rep. Laurie Pettengill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 48, PG.1631 | |
2011-05-26 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for June 1 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 43, PG.1497 | |
2011-05-10 | House Executive Session: 5/24/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 10:00 Amendment)== | |
2011-05-05 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 5/10/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-03-29 | House Public Hearing: 4/7/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-03-16 | House Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 28, Pg.882 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 8, Pg.99 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0417s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8, Pg.91 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Committee Amendment 0417s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.91 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-0417s, 3/9/11; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2011-02-01 | Senate Hearing: 2/10/2011, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 10 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary, Senate Journal 3, Pg.36 |