NH HR7 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Laid on Table (Rep Theberge): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.782
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Laid on Table (Rep Theberge): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.782
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging the New Hampshire congressional delegation to sponsor and support a constitutional amendment to re-establish the authority of the states and Congress to regulate campaign spending by entities created by law.
Title
Urging the New Hampshire congressional delegation to sponsor and support a constitutional amendment to re-establish the authority of the states and Congress to regulate campaign spending by entities created by law.
Sponsors
Rep. Beatriz Pastor-Bodmer [D] | Rep. Patricia Higgins [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Robert Cushing [D] |
Sen. David Pierce [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | House | Laid on Table (Rep Theberge): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.782 |
2013-03-06 | House | Special Order to Mar 13 Without Objection; House Journal 24, PG.703 |
2013-02-19 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 22, PG.518 |
2013-02-19 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 13 (Vote 6-4; Part I, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.518 |
2013-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 2/14/2013 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 ==(ROOM CHANGE (Orig Legislative Office Building 203)== |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/7/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.201 |