NH HJR1 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making restitution to Jeffery Frost for inappropriate prosecution.
Title
Making restitution to Jeffery Frost for inappropriate prosecution.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. Michael Sylvia [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Rep. John Burt [R] |
Rep. Kimberly Rice [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. J.R. Hoell [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 4 |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/09/2017 (Vote 10-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 4 |
2017-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 01/31/2017 Legislative Office Building 104 |
2017-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 3 P. 15 |