NH HB95 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB95
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-21 - Signed by Governor Sununu 03/18/2022; Chapter 6; 05/17/22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-21 - Signed by Governor Sununu 03/18/2022; Chapter 6; 05/17/22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to milk pasteurization.
Title
Relative to milk pasteurization.
Sponsors
Rep. James Allard [R] | Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. Judy Aron [R] | Rep. Stephen Woodcock [D] |
Rep. Steven Smith [R] | Rep. Brodie Deshaies [R] | Rep. Alicia Lekas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 03/18/2022; Chapter 6; 05/17/22 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 02/24/2022); Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-15 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-02-16 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-2300S (Rep. Pearl): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-2300s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-2234s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Sen. French Floor Amendment # 2021-2300s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1 |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2234s, 01/05/2022; Senate Calendar 49 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Rerefer to Committee, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 12Y-12N, Motion Failed; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 04/01/2021; Senate Calendar 17 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 03/23/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-02-24 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0190h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 7 |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendment # 2021-0190h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 7 |
2021-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0190h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 5 |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/27/2021 02:45 pm Members of the public may attend using the following links:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92887623403 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 2 P. 35 |
Same As/Similar To
HB95 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Sen. Bradley Moved to Rerefer to Committee, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10