NH HB95 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Sen. Bradley Moved to Rerefer to Committee, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to milk pasteurization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to milk pasteurization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - House - Rereferred (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Rereferred (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Rerefer to Committee, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
2021-04-01SenateRereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 12Y-12N, Motion Failed; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
2021-03-23SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 04/01/2021; Senate Calendar 17
2021-03-16SenateRemote Hearing: 03/23/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 16
2021-03-04SenateIntroduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 7
2021-02-24HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0190h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 7
2021-02-24HouseAmendment # 2021-0190h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 7
2021-02-10HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0190h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 5
2021-01-20HousePublic Hearing: 01/27/2021 02:45 pm Members of the public may attend using the following links:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92887623403 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-04HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 2 P. 35

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback