NH HB93 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Lay HB93 on Table (Rep. T. Walsh): Motion Adopted DV 205-162 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Lay HB93 on Table (Rep. T. Walsh): Motion Adopted DV 205-162 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing municipalities to reduce speed limits seasonally.
Title
Authorizing municipalities to reduce speed limits seasonally.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Lay HB93 on Table (Rep. T. Walsh): Motion Adopted DV 205-162 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 68 |
2023-03-08 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB93 03/06/2023 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 18 |
2023-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/07/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-02-16 | House | Public Hearing: 02/21/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Transportation |