NH HB91 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB91
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-28 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass 10/28/21 (Vote ; 21-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-28 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass 10/28/21 (Vote ; 21-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to death benefits of first responders who die from suicide.
Title
Relative to death benefits of first responders who die from suicide.
Sponsors
Sen. Daryl Abbas [R] | Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Rep. Fred Doucette [R] | Rep. Terry Roy [R] |
Rep. Douglas Trottier [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 150 N: 206 NV: 13 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 10/28/21 (Vote ; 21-0) |
2021-10-06 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2021-08-31 | House | Division I Work Session: 09/14/2021 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2021-03-30 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Executive Session: 03/29/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92166004660 |
2021-03-04 | House | Division I Work Session: 03/09/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94444579237 |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to Finance 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 42 |
2021-02-24 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 42 |
2021-02-24 | House | FLAM # 2021-0401h (Reps. Leishman, Hatch): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 150-206 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 42 |
2021-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 14-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 19 |
2021-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 01/27/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/92995497899 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time thecommittee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 34 |
Same As/Similar To
HB91 (Carry Over) 2021-10-28 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass 10/28/21 (Vote ; 21-0)