NH HB75 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/23/2021; Chapter 126; Eff: 09/21/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/23/2021; Chapter 126; Eff: 09/21/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Renaming and adjusting the membership of the New Hampshire commission on deafness and hearing loss.
Title
Renaming and adjusting the membership of the New Hampshire commission on deafness and hearing loss.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-26 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/23/2021; Chapter 126; Eff: 09/21/2021 |
2021-07-12 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-10 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1007s (Rep. M. Pearson): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 10 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-1007s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Amendment Adopted; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1007s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1007s, 04/01/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Captioning is provided by Relay Conference Captioning and available at the following link: https://www.captionedtext.com/client/event.aspx?EventID=4746135&Customer |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 03/24/2021, 09:30 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-02-24 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 10 |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 7 |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96551569054 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time thecommittee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 34 |