NH HB726 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a secure forensic psychiatric hospital advisory council and establishing a new forensic psychiatric hospital and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a secure forensic psychiatric hospital advisory council and establishing a new forensic psychiatric hospital and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - Remove from Table (Y: 10 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - House - Laid on Table (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment 1456s (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11SenatePending Motion OT3rdg; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12
2019-04-11SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Remove From Table, Regular Calendar 10Y-13N, Motion Failed; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12
2019-04-11SenatePending Motion OT3rdg; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12
2019-04-11SenateSen. Feltes Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12
2019-04-11SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2019-1344s, and 2019-1456s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12
2019-04-11SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2019-1456s, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12
2019-04-11SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1344s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12
2019-04-01SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1344s, 04/11/2019; Senate Calendar 17
2019-03-20SenateHearing: 03/26/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-18SenateIntroduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 9
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Finance 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 44
2019-02-27HouseReferral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 46(f) 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 45
2019-02-27HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0633h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 44
2019-02-27HouseAmendment # 2019-0633h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 44
2019-02-21HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0633h (NT) for 02/27/2019 (Vote 18-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 17
2019-02-12House==TIME CHANGE== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 204
2019-02-12House==TIME CHANGE== Executive Session: 02/21/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 02/12/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 204
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 28

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=113&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB726
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=113&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=113
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=113
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=125&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=HB0726&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB726&ddlsponsors=&lsr=113
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=126&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=HB0726&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB726&ddlsponsors=&lsr=113
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=128&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=HB0726&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB726&ddlsponsors=&lsr=113

Bill Comments

feedback