NH HB687 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-15 - Committee Report: Without Recommendation (Vote ; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to extreme risk protection orders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to extreme risk protection orders.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-15HouseCommittee Report: Without Recommendation (Vote ; Regular Calendar)
2019-10-03HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/10/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-10-02HouseExecutive Session: 10/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204
2019-10-02HouseFull Committee Work Session: 10/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-09-20HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/01/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204
2019-09-09HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-08-29HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/05/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-06-18HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 08/22/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-06-05HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 06/11/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204
2019-03-13HouseRetained in Committee
2019-02-26HouseExecutive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-01-23House==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 03/05/2019 10:00 am Reps Hall
2019-01-17HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 26

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback