NH HB687 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB687

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Veto Sustained 09/16/2020: Regular Calendar 182-156 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to extreme risk protection orders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to extreme risk protection orders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-17 - House - Veto Override (Y: 0 N: 11 NV: 344 Abs: 33) [FAIL]
2020-06-29 - House - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 201 N: 176 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 213 N: 162 NV: 4 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-17HouseVeto Sustained 09/16/2020: Regular Calendar 182-156 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
2020-08-10HouseVetoed by Governor Sununu 08/07/2020
2020-07-16SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9
2020-07-16HouseEnrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10
2020-07-10HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2020-1630: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020
2020-07-09SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2020-1630e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9
2020-06-29SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9
2020-06-24SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 06/29/2020; Senate Calendar 25
2020-06-19SenateThe following email will be monitored throughout the meeting by someone who can assist with and alert the committee to any technical issues: remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us or call (603-271-3043). Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19Senate6. To view/listen to this hearing on YouTube, use this link: https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCjBZdtrjRnQdmg-2MPMiWrA Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19Senate5. Webinar ID: 949 5457 3376 Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19Senate4. Or iPhone one-tap: 13126266799,,94954573376# or 19292056099,,94954573376# Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19Senate3. To listen via telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): 1-301-715-8592, or 1-312-626-6799, or 1-929-205-6099, or 1-253-215-8782, or 1-346-248-7799, or 1-669-900-6833 Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19Senate2. To submit your testimony to the committee, please send all documents via email to remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19Senate1. To sign-in and/or speak in support or opposition, please register in advance by using this link: https://www.zoom.us/webinar/register/WN_QH1esiFMQNC5q9CjM5O_jA Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19SenateMembers of the public may attend using the following links: Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19SenateCommittee members will receive secure Zoom invitations via email. Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19SenateRemote Hearing: 06/24/2020, 09:10 am; Senate Calendar 24
2020-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7
2020-01-09HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2790h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 201-176 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 68
2020-01-09HouseAmendment # 2019-2790h: Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 213-162 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 68
2019-11-15HouseCommittee Report: Without Recommendation (Vote ; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 19
2019-10-03HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/10/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-10-02HouseExecutive Session: 10/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204
2019-10-02HouseFull Committee Work Session: 10/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-09-20HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/01/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204
2019-09-09HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-08-29HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/05/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-06-18HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 08/22/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-06-05HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 06/11/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204
2019-03-13HouseRetained in Committee
2019-02-26HouseExecutive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-01-23House==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 03/05/2019 10:00 am Reps Hall
2019-01-17HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 26

Same As/Similar To

HB687 (Carry Over) 2019-11-15 - Committee Report: Without Recommendation (Vote ; Regular Calendar)

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=7&sy=2020&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB687
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&id=7&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=7
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&v=SP&id=7
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&id=5&txtFormat=html
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=4&sy=2020&lb=H&eb=HB0687&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB687&ddlsponsors=&lsr=7
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=5&sy=2020&lb=H&eb=HB0687&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB687&ddlsponsors=&lsr=7
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=92&sy=2020&lb=S&eb=HB0687&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB687&ddlsponsors=&lsr=7
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=210&sy=2020&lb=H&eb=HB0687&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB687&ddlsponsors=&lsr=7

Bill Comments

feedback