NH HB669 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.672
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to nonpayment of property taxes on current use land.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to nonpayment of property taxes on current use land.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-06HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.672
2013-02-21HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 6 (Vote 15-2; Part I Regular Calendar); House Calendar 20, PG.417
2013-02-11HouseExecutive Session: 2/19/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2013-02-06HousePublic Hearing: 2/12/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 303
2013-02-06HouseReferred to Environment and Agriculture; House Journal 16, PG.299
2013-02-06HouseVacated from Municipal and County Government: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.299
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG.205

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback