NH HB643 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to legalizing marijuana.
Title
Relative to legalizing marijuana.
Sponsors
Rep. Hope Damon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 70 |
2023-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB643-FN-A 02/03/2023 (Vote 16-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 18 |
2023-01-24 | House | Executive Session: 02/03/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2023 10:30 am State House Reps Hall |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 24 |