NH HB638 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 198-156 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 198-156 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring health care providers to provide an opioid disclosure form to patients for whom an opioid is prescribed.
Title
Requiring health care providers to provide an opioid disclosure form to patients for whom an opioid is prescribed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 198-156 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 43 |
2019-02-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0287h |
2019-02-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/07/2019 (Vote 12-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 13 |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-02-06 | House | Division I Subcommittee Work Session: 02/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 23 |