NH HB628 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-10 - Full Committee Work Session: 05/30/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-10 - Full Committee Work Session: 05/30/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain non-public schools or education service providers that accept public funds to perform background checks on all employees and volunteers.
Title
Requiring certain non-public schools or education service providers that accept public funds to perform background checks on all employees and volunteers.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Tanner [D] | Rep. Mary Heath [D] | Rep. David Luneau [D] | Rep. Patricia Cornell [D] |
Rep. Sallie Fellows [D] | Rep. Hope Damon [D] | Sen. Suzanne Prentiss [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/30/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-03-10 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/10/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 23 |