NH HB623 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB623
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-09-11 - Executive Session: 10/03/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-09-11 - Executive Session: 10/03/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a teacher candidate loan forgiveness program.
Title
Establishing a teacher candidate loan forgiveness program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-11 | House | Executive Session: 10/03/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-09-11 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 10/03/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-03 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 47 |
2023-11-17 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 11/13/2023 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 9 |
2023-10-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/31/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 House Calendar 43 |
2023-10-10 | House | Executive Session: 11/13/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-10-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/17/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 House Calendar 41 |
2023-09-05 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 House Calendar 36 |
2023-05-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/30/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-02-16 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-02-08 | House | Executive Session: 02/15/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-02-08 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/13/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2023 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 23 |
Same As/Similar To
HB623 (Carry Over) 2023-09-05 - Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 House Calendar 36