NH HB609 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB609
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-20 - Executive Session: 10/25/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building210-211
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-20 - Executive Session: 10/25/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building210-211
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a student career and college investment program and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Establishing a student career and college investment program and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gile [D] | Rep. Patricia Lovejoy [D] | Rep. Carolyn Gargasz [R] | Rep. Mary Wallner [D] |
Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Sen. Jeff Woodburn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-20 | House | Executive Session: 10/25/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building210-211 |
2018-09-19 | House | Division II Work Session: 10/11/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building209 |
2018-09-14 | House | Division II Work Session: 09/19/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building209 |
2018-03-21 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 3 |
2018-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/21/2018 (Vote 26-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 3 |
2018-03-02 | House | Executive Session: 03/14/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-02-28 | House | Division II Work Session: 02/28/2018 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2018-02-21 | House | Division II Work Session: 02/28/2018 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-02-06 | House | Division II Work Session: 02/13/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2018-01-24 | House | Division II Work Session: 02/06/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2018-01-17 | House | Division II Work Session: 01/24/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2018-01-11 | House | Division II Work Session: 01/18/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 209 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-01-03 | House | Referred to Finance 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 60 |
2018-01-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2427h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 60 |
2018-01-03 | House | Amendment # 2017-2427h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 58 |
2017-11-16 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2427h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar) |
2017-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 11/08/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-08-22 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/19/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-05-24 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 06/08/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-02-08 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/01/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-23 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 21 |
Same As/Similar To
HB609 (Carry Over) 2017-11-16 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2427h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar)