NH HB609 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB609
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-16 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2427h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-16 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2427h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a children's savings account program and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Establishing a children's savings account program and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gile [D] | Rep. Patricia Lovejoy [D] | Sen. Jeff Woodburn [D] | Rep. Carolyn Gargasz [R] |
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Rep. Mary Wallner [D] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-16 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2427h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar) |
2017-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 11/08/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-08-22 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/19/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-05-24 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 06/08/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-02-08 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/01/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-23 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 21 |
Same As/Similar To
HB609 (Carry Over) 2017-11-16 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2427h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar)