NH HB603 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB603
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-28 - Full Committee Work Session: 10/05/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-28 - Full Committee Work Session: 10/05/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to manslaughter and the use of deadly force in circumstances involving the sale or use of a controlled drug or controlled drug analog.
Title
Relative to manslaughter and the use of deadly force in circumstances involving the sale or use of a controlled drug or controlled drug analog.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 10/05/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-09-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/07/2021 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2021-09-02 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/09/2021 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2021-08-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 08/31/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2021-08-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 08/24/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2021-03-09 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Public Hearing: 03/01/2021 02:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93127871930 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-13 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 56 |
Same As/Similar To
HB603 (Carry Over) 2021-09-28 - Full Committee Work Session: 10/05/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203