NH HB597 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-12 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2261h for Jan 8 (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-12 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2261h for Jan 8 (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to mandatory drug testing for certain health care workers.
Title
Relative to mandatory drug testing for certain health care workers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2261h for Jan 8 (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar) |
2013-08-09 | House | Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/30/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-08-08 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/10/2013 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-07-19 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/6/2013 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-06-04 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/11/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-05-28 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/4/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-05-22 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/28/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-05-15 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/21/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-03-07 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 3/7/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-02-26 | House | Continued Public Hearing: 3/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-02-11 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 2/26/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.202 |