NH HB568 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-06 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 6, PG.269
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-06 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 6, PG.269
Summary
Relative to the taxation of tobacco products other than cigarettes.
Title
Relative to the taxation of tobacco products other than cigarettes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 6, PG.269 | |
2009-11-05 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 Consent Calendar (vote 19-0); House Calendar 2, PG.87 | |
2009-10-07 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/28/2009 Legislative Office Building 202 1:30 PM or Immediately Following Session | |
2009-03-19 | House Retained in Committee | |
2009-03-16 | House Executive Session: 3/18/2009 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 (Continued 3/19/09 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 If Needed) | |
2009-03-16 | House Full Committee Work Session: 3/17/2009 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2009-03-11 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/16/2009 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2009-02-25 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/6/2009 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2009-02-11 | House Public Hearing: 2/19/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2009-01-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 12, PG.233 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=701&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |