NH HB562 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB562
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-21 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-21 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting victims of trafficking in persons from participating in children in need of services proceedings.
Title
Exempting victims of trafficking in persons from participating in children in need of services proceedings.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Massimilla [D] | Rep. Laura Pantelakos [D] | Rep. Timothy Smith [D] | Rep. Timothy Egan [D] |
Rep. Anita Burroughs [D] | Rep. Gary Merchant [D] | Sen. Erin Hennessey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-21 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) |
2021-08-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/15/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Executive Session: 03/11/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91927749754 |
2021-03-04 | House | Public Hearing: 03/04/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94672611666 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 2 P. 53 |
Same As/Similar To
HB562 (Carry Over) 2021-09-21 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar)