NH HB559 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB559
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-04 - Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. S. Pearson): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 201-174 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 134
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-04 - Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. S. Pearson): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 201-174 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 134
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a state retirement plan group for new state employee members of the retirement system.
Title
Establishing a state retirement plan group for new state employee members of the retirement system.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan McGuire [R] | Rep. Tony Lekas [R] | Rep. John Lewicke [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-03 - House - Indefinitely Postpone (Y: 201 N: 174 NV: 13 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-01-03 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 181 N: 192 NV: 15 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2024-01-03 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 181 N: 192 NV: 15 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-04 | House | Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. S. Pearson): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 201-174 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 134 |
2024-01-04 | House | Amendment # 2023-2406h: Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 181-192 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 130 |
2023-11-16 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 11/08/2023 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 35 |
2023-09-18 | House | Executive Session: 11/08/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-03-13 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-03-07 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/10/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-02-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/24/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2023-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-02-08 | House | Public Hearing: 02/15/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 20 |
Same As/Similar To
HB559 (Carry Over) 2023-09-18 - Executive Session: 11/08/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308