NH HB557 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0746h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0746h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the authority of state and county correctional facilities to discipline inmates using close or solitary confinement.
Title
Relative to the authority of state and county correctional facilities to discipline inmates using close or solitary confinement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0746h |
2021-03-23 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 68 |
2021-03-10 | House | Public Hearing: 03/10/2021 01:45 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92387218591 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 53 |