NH HB557 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB557
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-10 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-10 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to school attendance in towns with no public schools.
Title
Relative to school attendance in towns with no public schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 188 N: 163 NV: 13 Abs: 31) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/27/2017; Senate Journal 15 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 04/27/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/28/2017, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0548h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 188-163 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 72 |
2017-03-08 | House | Amendment #2017-0548h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 70 |
2017-02-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2017-02-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0548h for 03/08/2017 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) |
2017-02-15 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/22/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-25 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/08/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 18 |
Same As/Similar To
HB557 (Carry Over) 2017-10-10 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate