NH HB541 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the priority of child support payments over other court costs and expenses.
Title
Relative to the priority of child support payments over other court costs and expenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 4 |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/03/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96640856922 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 2 P. 53 |