NH HB540 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB540
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 04/29/2021; Senate Journal 13
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 04/29/2021; Senate Journal 13
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to supported decision-making as an alternative to guardianship.
Title
Relative to supported decision-making as an alternative to guardianship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 04/29/2021; Senate Journal 13 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 04/29/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 21 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0565h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 38 |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment # 2021-0565h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 38 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/14/2021, 02:00 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2021-03-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0565h (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 18 |
2021-03-10 | House | Executive Session: 03/10/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95164452682 |
2021-03-02 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95501229688 |
2021-02-26 | House | Public Hearing: 02/26/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91679735236 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 53 |
Same As/Similar To
HB540 (Carry Over) 2021-04-29 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 04/29/2021; Senate Journal 13