NH HB514 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - Vetoed by Governor Sununu 08/09/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - Vetoed by Governor Sununu 08/09/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Imposing a waiting period between the purchase and delivery of a firearm.
Title
Imposing a waiting period between the purchase and delivery of a firearm.
Sponsors
Rep. Katherine Rogers [D] | Rep. Michael Abbott [D] | Rep. Timothy Josephson [D] | Rep. Garrett Muscatel [D] |
Rep. Jacqueline Chretien [D] | Rep. Donna Mombourquette [D] | Rep. Lisa Bunker [D] | Rep. Casey Conley [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-18 - House - Veto Override (Y: 217 N: 163 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - House - Concur (Y: 197 N: 160 NV: 6 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - OTPA (Y: 199 N: 147 NV: 20 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - House - Concur (Y: 197 N: 160 NV: 6 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - OTPA (Y: 199 N: 147 NV: 20 Abs: 34) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-13 | House | Vetoed by Governor Sununu 08/09/2019 |
2019-09-18 | House | Veto Sustained 09/18/2019: Regular Calendar 217-163 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote House Journal 21 P. 38 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1959s (Rep. Cushing): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 197-160 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 6 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1959s, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1959s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Special Order to the beginning of the regular calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1959s, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Hearing: 04/30/2019, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0421h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 199-147 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 99 |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment # 2019-0421h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 99 |
2019-03-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-03-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0421h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 24 |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-01-16 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 02/13/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 18 |