NH HB513 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-17 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-17 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to complaint investigation procedures of the guardian ad litem board.
Title
Relative to complaint investigation procedures of the guardian ad litem board.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Oligny [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. Frederick Rice [R] |
Rep. Laura Pantelakos [D] | Rep. Patrick Abrami [R] | Rep. James Verschueren [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-17 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2015-11-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2001h for Jan 6 (Vote 9-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 12-13 |
2015-09-16 | House | Executive Session: 9/29/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-08-24 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/16/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-05-27 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/2/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-05-05 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/12/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-03-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 3/17/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-03-04 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-24 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Children and Family Law; House Journal 12, PG. 227 |