NH HB510 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to limiting robocalls by automatic dialing devices.
Title
Relative to limiting robocalls by automatic dialing devices.
Sponsors
Rep. Jacqueline Chretien [D] | Rep. Walter Stapleton [R] | Rep. Safiya Wazir [D] | Rep. Megan Murray [D] |
Rep. Israel Piedra [D] | Rep. Eric Gallager [D] | Rep. Tony Labranche [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 6 |
2021-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 5 |
2021-03-03 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/03/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98917516497 (if necessary) |
2021-03-02 | House | Executive Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95215897452 |
2021-02-17 | House | Public Hearing: 02/17/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99607943571 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 51 |