NH HB494 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB494
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-20 - ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 10/19/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 38
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-20 - ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 10/19/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 38
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to fees collected under the New Hampshire fertilizer law.
Title
Relative to fees collected under the New Hampshire fertilizer law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-20 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 10/19/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 38 |
2023-09-20 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Full Committee Work Session: 10/19/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 38 |
2023-09-20 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 10/10/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 38 |
2023-09-20 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 10/10/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 38 |
2023-09-13 | House | Executive Session: 09/19/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 37 |
2023-08-09 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/19/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-03-21 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | Executive Session: 03/15/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-03-07 | House | Public Hearing: 03/13/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 57 |
2023-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 57 |
2023-02-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 01/31/2023 (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 22 |
2023-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 01/31/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 3 P. 18 |
Same As/Similar To
HB494 (Carry Over) 2023-09-20 - ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 10/19/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 38