NH HB479 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/27/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to eligibility for the low and moderate income homeowners property tax relief.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to eligibility for the low and moderate income homeowners property tax relief.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/27/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
2019-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 02/12/2019 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/22/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-01-10HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback