NH HB471 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB471
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to final disposition hearings in divorce proceedings.
Title
Relative to final disposition hearings in divorce proceedings.
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Yokela [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 33 |
2023-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB471-FN 10/31/2023 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 3 |
2023-10-12 | House | Executive Session: 10/31/2023 10:0 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 41 |
2023-09-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/17/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 38 |
2023-02-24 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/07/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-02-09 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-19 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 3 P. 17 |
Same As/Similar To
HB471 (Carry Over) 2023-09-20 - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/17/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 38