NH HB452 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB452
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-25 - Executive Session: 10/25/2021 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308
Pending: House Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-25 - Executive Session: 10/25/2021 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308
Pending: House Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Precluding the secretary of state from running for another office while serving as secretary of state.
Title
Precluding the secretary of state from running for another office while serving as secretary of state.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Bouldin [D] | Rep. Peter Bixby [D] | Rep. Connie Van Houten [D] | Rep. Patricia Cornell [D] |
Rep. Betty Gay [R] | Rep. Casey Conley [D] | Rep. Amanda Bouldin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-25 | House | Executive Session: 10/25/2021 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2021-08-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/08/2021 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2021-03-11 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/99308877767 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 48 |
Same As/Similar To
HB452 (Carry Over) 2021-10-25 - Executive Session: 10/25/2021 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308