NH HB452 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB452
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Summary
Precluding the secretary of state from running for another office while serving as secretary of state.
Title
Precluding the secretary of state from running for another office while serving as secretary of state.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Bouldin [D] | Rep. Peter Bixby [D] | Rep. Connie Van Houten [D] | Rep. Patricia Cornell [D] |
Rep. Betty Gay [R] | Rep. Casey Conley [D] | Rep. Amanda Bouldin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-03 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB452 11/02/2021 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 10 |
2021-10-25 | House | Executive Session: 10/25/2021 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2021-08-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/08/2021 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2021-03-11 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/99308877767 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 48 |
Same As/Similar To
HB452 (Carry Over) 2021-10-25 - Executive Session: 10/25/2021 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=675&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=HB452 |